**EG1) 23 x 25**

**First, you draw a grid like above and put the numbers you are multiplying like above. For example 2 x 3 = 6 so on the top you put 0 and on the bottom you put 6. You work out all the sums. Once you have done that you add up the answer diagonally. First add 5 to 0 = 5. 9 + 1 + 0 = 10. 0 + 6 + 1 = 7. 0 + 0 = 0. You answer is 805.**

2. 352 x 201

3. 336 x 21

__Questions__

1. 361 x 462. 352 x 201

3. 336 x 21